ID SCR103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2019-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-0-5 |
2019-03-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |