ID S1459 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL SERVICES OMBUDSMAN -- DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE FOR INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of Health and Social Services Ombudsman and the Department of Health and Welfare for Indirect Support Services for fiscal year 2025.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of Health and Social Services Ombudsman and the Department of Health and Welfare for Indirect Support Services for fiscal year 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-04-02 | House | to Senate |
2024-04-02 | House | Title apvd |
2024-04-02 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-04-02 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
APPROPRIATIONS
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE FOR INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES
OFFICE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL SERVICES OMBUDSMAN
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE FOR INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES
OFFICE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL SERVICES OMBUDSMAN