ID S1424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPREME COURT -- Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2021.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |