ID S1411 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - to W/M
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - to W/M
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and repeals existing law to establish the Poultry Environmental Control Act, the Swine Environmental Control Act and the Local Option Extra Large Swine Operations Siting Act.
Title
Adds to and repeals existing law to establish the Poultry Environmental Control Act, the Swine Environmental Control Act and the Local Option Extra Large Swine Operations Siting Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | to W/M | |
2010-03-24 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-24 | House intro | |
2010-03-23 | to House | |
2010-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 24-11-0 | |
2010-03-19 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt engros | |
2010-03-18 | to engros | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-03-17 | to 14th Ord | |
2010-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-16 | to Agric Aff | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-15 | to printing | |
2010-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-15 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1411.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1411.pdf |