ID S1396 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Session Law Chapter 170 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateSession Law Chapter 170 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-16SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-03-16HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-03-16SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-03-13SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-03-12Houseto Senate
2020-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-12HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-11HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-11HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-03-10Senateto House
2020-03-10SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-10SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2020-03-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-05SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2020-03-04SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback