ID S1396 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/16 Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS - LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR - Appropriates $170,000 to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 3; and authorizes lump sum spending authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $170,000 to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 3; and authorizes lump sum spending authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateSigned by Governor on 03/28/16 Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-23SenateReported delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on 03/23/16
2016-03-23SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2016-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2016-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2016-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2016-03-17Houseto Senate
2016-03-17HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-17HousePASSED -- 69-0-1
2016-03-17HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-15HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2016-03-14Senateto House
2016-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-14SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2016-03-14SenateRead third time in full
2016-03-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-03-10SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-03-10SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2016-03-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback