ID S1390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal years 2022 and 2023.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal years 2022 and 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Order ret’d to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 24-46-0 |
2022-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 24-10-1 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |