ID S1372 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to St Aff
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to St Aff
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise procedures for procurement of public works construction by a political subdivision; and for procuring services or personal property by a political subdivision to provide that once the bid is awarded, all bids and bid documents shall be open to public inspection pursuant to the public records act.
Title
Amends existing law to revise procedures for procurement of public works construction by a political subdivision; and for procuring services or personal property by a political subdivision to provide that once the bid is awarded, all bids and bid documents shall be open to public inspection pursuant to the public records act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | to St Aff | |
2012-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-22 | House intro | |
2012-03-21 | to House | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | Winder | |
2012-03-21 | 35-0-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-21 | PASSED | |
2012-03-21 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-16 | Ref'd to Transp | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to St Aff | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-05 | to printing | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | Senate intro |