ID S1350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law to establish a State Treasurer Investment Advisory Board, to provide for board member appointment and removal, board vacancies, quorum and meetings, and board member compensation, to provide for the recommendation of types of investments, to provide for audits and reports; to remove securities lending agreements as an allowable investment of the State Treasurer; and to provide the State Treasurer's ability to continue investment of state funds or any other funds in his hands under securities lending agreements in place and to provide for reports.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to establish a State Treasurer Investment Advisory Board, to provide for board member appointment and removal, board vacancies, quorum and meetings, and board member compensation, to provide for the recommendation of types of investments, to provide for audits and reports; to remove securities lending agreements as an allowable investment of the State Treasurer; and to provide the State Treasurer's ability to continue investment of state funds or any other funds in his hands under securities lending agreements in place and to provide for reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/18/14 Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-03 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |