ID S1338 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CAMPAIGNS -- Amends existing law to provide for public disclosure of certain campaign contact information.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for public disclosure of certain campaign contact information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2022-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |