ID S1338 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to enticing a child to revise provisions relating to enticing a child through use of the internet or other communication device and to provide that it is not necessary for the prosecution to make a certain showing in a certain prosecution.
Title
Amends existing law relating to enticing a child to revise provisions relating to enticing a child through use of the internet or other communication device and to provide that it is not necessary for the prosecution to make a certain showing in a certain prosecution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-2-5 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Jud | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | House intro | |
2012-03-05 | to House | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Jud | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro |