ID S1336 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported out without amendments; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported out without amendments; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide for legislative standing to participate in lawsuits and to provide for indemnification.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for legislative standing to participate in lawsuits and to provide for indemnification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out without amendments; referred to: State Affairs |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/S1336.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/S1336.pdf |