ID S1331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - to Educ
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - to Educ
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain adjustments to a district's salary-based apportionment.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain adjustments to a district's salary-based apportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | to Educ | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | House intro | |
2012-03-01 | to House | |
2012-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-17 | to Educ | |
2012-02-17 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-16 | to printing | |
2012-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-16 | Senate intro |