ID S1323 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RAPE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding penetration and rape.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding penetration and rape.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2022-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |