ID S1317 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to, amends and repeals existing law relating to cruelty to animals to revise violation and penalty provisions relating to cruelty, torture and animal fights; to provide that abandonment shall constitute a misdemeanor; to provide penalty provisions; to provide for the remittance of collected fines; and to provide for those that give false information in reporting alleged violations.
Title
Adds to, amends and repeals existing law relating to cruelty to animals to revise violation and penalty provisions relating to cruelty, torture and animal fights; to provide that abandonment shall constitute a misdemeanor; to provide penalty provisions; to provide for the remittance of collected fines; and to provide for those that give false information in reporting alleged violations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-02 | House intro | |
2010-03-01 | to House | |
2010-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-1-0 | |
2010-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-08 | to Agric Aff | |
2010-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-05 | to printing | |
2010-02-05 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-05 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1317.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1317.pdf |