ID S1316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding construction work and the application of water to full beneficial use, lapses of permits, and the issuance of licenses and to provide for extensions of time and permits held by municipal providers for reasonably anticipated future needs.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding construction work and the application of water to full beneficial use, lapses of permits, and the issuance of licenses and to provide for extensions of time and permits held by municipal providers for reasonably anticipated future needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |