ID S1300 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PRETRIAL RELEASE -- Adds to existing law to authorize a court to determine whether a pretrial supervision program is appropriate and to provide for a pretrial supervision fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to authorize a court to determine whether a pretrial supervision program is appropriate and to provide for a pretrial supervision fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseRetained on General Orders
2018-03-20HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-03-05HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-02Senateto House
2018-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-5-1
2018-02-28SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback