ID S1285 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise terms of office and to establish provisions relating to an alternative election of highway commissioners.
Title
Amends existing law to revise terms of office and to establish provisions relating to an alternative election of highway commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Ret'd to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | FAILED -- 20-46-4 |
2014-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-03-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |