ID S1275 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - to Jud
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - to Jud
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to the Traffic Safety Education Program to provide the board of county commissioners in each county as well as to provide cities with the authority to establish a Traffic Safety Education Program, to provide requirements for such program and to provide for the imposition and deposit of certain fees.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to the Traffic Safety Education Program to provide the board of county commissioners in each county as well as to provide cities with the authority to establish a Traffic Safety Education Program, to provide requirements for such program and to provide for the imposition and deposit of certain fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | to Jud | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | House intro | |
2012-03-01 | to House | |
2012-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-3 | |
2012-02-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Jud | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | Senate intro |