ID S1267 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Session Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2020 Contingent on legislation approved by the state of Washington.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME -- Adds to existing law to provide that certain areas of the State of Idaho shall make daylight saving time the permanent time upon a specified condition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that certain areas of the State of Idaho shall make daylight saving time the permanent time upon a specified condition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSession Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2020 Contingent on legislation approved by the state of Washington.
2020-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-03-11SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-03-11SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-03-10Houseto Senate
2020-03-10HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-10HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1
2020-03-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-03-06HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 9, 2020
2020-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-03-03HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2020-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-26Senateto House
2020-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2020-02-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-01-30SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback