ID S1264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LAND REMEDIATION -- Amends existing law to revise legislative findings and to revise provisions regarding rescission.
Title
Amends existing law to revise legislative findings and to revise provisions regarding rescission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2022-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | to House |
2022-03-03 | House | No motion for reconsideration received |
2022-03-01 | House | Held at Desk |
2022-03-01 | House | Notice to reconsider |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 22-10-3 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported out without amendments; filed for second reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |