ID S1261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 140 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 140 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to nurses to provide that the Board of Nursing shall have the power and duty to evaluate and develop, or to enter into contracts or agreements with others to evaluate and develop, the education, distribution and availability of the nursing workforce for the purpose of improving the delivery of quality health care.
Title
Amends existing law relating to nurses to provide that the Board of Nursing shall have the power and duty to evaluate and develop, or to enter into contracts or agreements with others to evaluate and develop, the education, distribution and availability of the nursing workforce for the purpose of improving the delivery of quality health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 140 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2012-03-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-22 | House intro | |
2012-02-21 | to House | |
2012-02-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-02-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-26 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-25 | to printing | |
2012-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-25 | Senate intro |