ID S1233 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Session Law Chapter 7 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CAMPAIGN FINANCE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the persons responsible for filing certain campaign finance reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the persons responsible for filing certain campaign finance reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateSession Law Chapter 7 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2020
2020-02-10SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-02-07HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-02-06SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-02-05SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-02-04Houseto Senate
2020-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2020-02-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-01-31HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 3, 2020
2020-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2020-01-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-01-27Senateto House
2020-01-27SenateTitle apvd
2020-01-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2020-01-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-01-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-01-20SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback