ID S1233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 23 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 23 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATH EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide for the STEM Action Center Advisory Board, to revise the terms of certain members of the board, to provide for staggered terms, to revise the duties of the STEM Action Center and to provide that the administrator shall report the progress of the STEM Action Center.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the STEM Action Center Advisory Board, to revise the terms of certain members of the board, to provide for staggered terms, to revise the duties of the STEM Action Center and to provide that the administrator shall report the progress of the STEM Action Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 23 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-02-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-3 |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2018-02-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |