ID S1192 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 04/11/13; 06/30/14 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 04/11/13; 06/30/14 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide that the administrator of the Division of Public Works shall develop facilities in the Capitol Mall and to create a process for exempting a certain Capitol Mall parking facility from planning and zoning restrictions.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that the administrator of the Division of Public Works shall develop facilities in the Capitol Mall and to create a process for exempting a certain Capitol Mall parking facility from planning and zoning restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 04/11/13; 06/30/14 Sunset Clause |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/05/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-04-03 | House | to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Title apvd |
2013-04-03 | House | Crane |
2013-04-03 | House | 42-26-2 AYES -- Anderson(01), Anderst, Andrus, Barrett, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Denney, Eskridge, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Luker, McMillan, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Palmer, Patterson, Raybould, Shepherd, Sims, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Barbieri, Bateman, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gannon, Harris, King, Kloc, Malek, Meline, Mendive, Morse, Packer, Pence, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Smith, Ward-Engelking, Wood(35), Woodings Absent and excused -- Loertscher, Perry Floor Sponsor |
2013-04-03 | House | PASSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-04-01 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Winder |
2013-03-29 | Senate | 24-11-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Keough, Lodge, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Bock, Buckner-Webb, Durst, Johnson, Lacey, Lakey, Martin, McKenzie, Schmidt, Stennett, Werk Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | PASSED |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |