ID S1179 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and transportation to establish provisions relating to agreements with authorized representatives of contiguous states for certain purposes and to establish provisions relating to certain Indian tribal members for purposes of vehicle registration and titling.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and transportation to establish provisions relating to agreements with authorized representatives of contiguous states for certain purposes and to establish provisions relating to certain Indian tribal members for purposes of vehicle registration and titling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-29 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-27 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2013-03-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Brackett |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Durst, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |