ID S1172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Recommitted to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Recommitted to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- STATE APPELLATE PUBLIC DEFENDER -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal years 2023 and 2024.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal years 2023 and 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |