ID S1155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to water districts to clarify compensation provisions relating to watermasters and assistants.
Title
Amends existing law relating to water districts to clarify compensation provisions relating to watermasters and assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/11/13 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-29 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-27 | House | Raybould |
2013-03-27 | House | 65-5-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood NAYS -- Burgoyne, Moyle, Ringo, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-27 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times |
2013-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2013-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 24-11-0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |