ID S1151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 252 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to revise conditions and requirements associated with the payment of certain damages caused by depredation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise conditions and requirements associated with the payment of certain damages caused by depredation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 252 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-25SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-22Houseto Senate
2019-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-12-4
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-13Senateto House
2019-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-04SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback