ID S1149 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- STATE LIQUOR DIVISION -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Liquor Division for fiscal year 2024.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the State Liquor Division for fiscal year 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Order ret’d to Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 20-14-1 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |