ID S1133 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law to revise and to establish additional provisions relating to the prohibition of federal regulation of certain firearms; to provide certain prohibited acts regarding firearms by public employees and officers of governmental entities, to provide penalties and to establish that certain laws are unenforceable in Idaho by state and local government officials, agents or employees.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to revise and to establish additional provisions relating to the prohibition of federal regulation of certain firearms; to provide certain prohibited acts regarding firearms by public employees and officers of governmental entities, to provide penalties and to establish that certain laws are unenforceable in Idaho by state and local government officials, agents or employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-04-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, April 4, 2013 |
2013-03-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-03-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2013-03-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-14 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-1-1 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |