ID S1099 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Amends existing law to provide for temporary alcohol-drug abuse treatment facilities.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for temporary alcohol-drug abuse treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |