ID S1097 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 03/27/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 03/27/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MEDICAID -- Adds to existing law to establish the Medicaid Management Information Systems Dedicated Fund in the state treasury.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Medicaid Management Information Systems Dedicated Fund in the state treasury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 154 Effective: 03/27/2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-23 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 40-27-3 |
2023-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2023-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-12-0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |