ID S1097 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to provide for coverage under a health benefit plan for participants in clinical trials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for coverage under a health benefit plan for participants in clinical trials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 192 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-18Houseto Senate
2019-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-26-1
2019-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback