ID S1097 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to provide for coverage under a health benefit plan for participants in clinical trials.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for coverage under a health benefit plan for participants in clinical trials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-26-1 |
2019-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |