ID S1081 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Signed by Governor on 03/16/15 Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH CARE - Amends existing law to provide reserves and surplus requirements of public postsecondary educational institutions with a public postsecondary educational institution plan for health care benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide reserves and surplus requirements of public postsecondary educational institutions with a public postsecondary educational institution plan for health care benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16SenateSigned by Governor on 03/16/15 Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-12SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/11/15
2015-03-11SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-03-10HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-03-06SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-03-05Houseto Senate
2015-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-05HousePASSED -- 64-0-6
2015-03-05HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-03-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-02-23HouseRead First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2015-02-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-02-20Senateto House
2015-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2015-02-20SenatePASSED -- 31-0-3
2015-02-20SenateRead third time in full
2015-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2015-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback