ID S1080 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 96 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAXES -- Amends existing law to remove language specifying a date after which a county auditor must deliver a missed property roll to the tax collector.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to remove language specifying a date after which a county auditor must deliver a missed property roll to the tax collector.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 96 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-16SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-13Houseto Senate
2017-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-03-10HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2017-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-02-21Senateto House
2017-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2017-02-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation
2017-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback