ID S1062 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding write-in candidates and signature verifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding write-in candidates and signature verifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-18HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-18HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-17Senateto House
2021-02-17SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-17SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2021-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-08SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback