ID S1039 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 67 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 67 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- Adds to existing law to provide that fees imposed on residential tenants shall be reasonable and to prohibit certain fees, fines, assessments, interests, and other costs.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that fees imposed on residential tenants shall be reasonable and to prohibit certain fees, fines, assessments, interests, and other costs.
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee | Sen. Doug Ricks [R] | Rep. Ted Hill [R] | Sen. Chris Trakel [R] |
Rep. Chenele Dixon [R] | Sen. James Ruchti [D] | Rep. Marco Erickson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 67 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-24 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2023-02-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 23-10-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |