ID S1038 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to provide for eduation savings accounts.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for eduation savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 12-23-0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |