ID S1020 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LANDOWNERS -- Amends existing law regarding the limitation of liability of landowners toward persons entering land for recreational purposes.
Title
Amends existing law regarding the limitation of liability of landowners toward persons entering land for recreational purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-15 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 63-4-3 |
2021-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 8, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-3-2 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |