ID S1020 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding when the Supreme Court must render a decision.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding when the Supreme Court must render a decision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Recommitted to State Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/S1020/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/S1020.pdf |