ID S1016 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESPIRATORY CARE PRACTICE ACT -- Repeals and adds to existing law to replace the Respiratory Care Practice Act.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to replace the Respiratory Care Practice Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-03-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-02-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |