ID S1007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide that local salary schedules for public school staff salaries shall include certain minimum amounts and to clarify eligibility requirements for professional endorsements and advanced professional endorsements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that local salary schedules for public school staff salaries shall include certain minimum amounts and to clarify eligibility requirements for professional endorsements and advanced professional endorsements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2021-01-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-01-26Senateto House
2021-01-26SenateTitle apvd
2021-01-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-01-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-01-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback