ID S1007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

COLLECTION AGENCIES -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise the licensing process for collection agencies and to create the Collection Agency Recovery Fund to allow reimbursement to persons to whom an Idaho court awards damages resulting from violations by a collection agent, debt counselor, credit counselor, or credit repair organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise the licensing process for collection agencies and to create the Collection Agency Recovery Fund to allow reimbursement to persons to whom an Idaho court awards damages resulting from violations by a collection agent, debt counselor, credit counselor, or credit repair organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to be returned to Business Committee
2019-03-26HouseRead Third Time in Full
2019-03-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-6-1
2019-02-25SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-22SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-22SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-21SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-21SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-13SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback