ID S1007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COLLECTION AGENCIES -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise the licensing process for collection agencies and to create the Collection Agency Recovery Fund to allow reimbursement to persons to whom an Idaho court awards damages resulting from violations by a collection agent, debt counselor, credit counselor, or credit repair organization.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise the licensing process for collection agencies and to create the Collection Agency Recovery Fund to allow reimbursement to persons to whom an Idaho court awards damages resulting from violations by a collection agent, debt counselor, credit counselor, or credit repair organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | U.C. to be returned to Business Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2019-03-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |