ID HR007 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REPRESENTATIVE SUE CHEW -- States findings of the House of Representatives and honors the service of Representative Sue Chew.
Title
States findings of the House of Representatives and honors the service of Representative Sue Chew.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2024-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-03-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |