ID HR006 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends House Rule 74 to change who determines the selection of and compensation for House attaches and provides that actions by the Speaker pursuant to this rule shall be taken after consultation with the majority and minority leadership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends House Rule 74 to change who determines the selection of and compensation for House attaches and provides that actions by the Speaker pursuant to this rule shall be taken after consultation with the majority and minority leadership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2014-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2014-03-05HouseWills
2014-03-05House68-0-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Anderson(01), Nielsen Floor Sponsor
2014-03-05HouseADOPTED
2014-03-05HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 59 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 11, read three times
2014-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2014-03-04HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2014-03-03HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
2014-02-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback