ID HJR005 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT -- Proposing an amendment to Article 7, Section 4, of the Idaho Constitution to provide for the taxation of public property leased to private entities if authorized by statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing an amendment to Article 7, Section 4, of the Idaho Constitution to provide for the taxation of public property leased to private entities if authorized by statute.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseU.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
2020-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2020
2020-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback