ID HJR001 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SESSIONS OF THE LEGISLATURE -- Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that the Legislature must convene in certain organizational sessions and must be convened in special session by the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that the Legislature must convene in certain organizational sessions and must be convened in special session by the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives in certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-01-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-01-21Houseto Senate
2021-01-21HouseTitle apvd
2021-01-21HousePreviously Read in Full -- ADOPTED 51-18-1
2021-01-21HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-01-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-01-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback